Husain, Aisha Tasadduq (CPSO#: 84824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uxbridge Health Centre
2 Elgin Park Drive Unit B
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone: (905) 852-1009
Fax: (905) 852-3531
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aisha Husain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Husain ( CPSO# 84824 )

Business Address:
Uxbridge Family Health Clinic
2 Elgin Park Drive
Unit B
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 852-1009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AISHA TASADDUQ HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008