Husain, Farhan Tasleem (CPSO#: 85698)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Rajasthan University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 18 Dec 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007