Husain, Saima Fathima (CPSO#: 86469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southmount Clinic
Suite 2C
35 Upper Centennial Parkway,
Stoney Creek, ON L8J 3W2
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: 1-855-210-0757
Fax: 905-662-3304
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: 701-4980 Kingsway Burnaby, BC V5H 4K7
Date Received: 19 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAIMA FATHIMA HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2018