Hussain, Asmaa Salah (CPSO#: 89139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
426 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1B9
Phone: (519) 637-8074
Fax: (519) 637-2646
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asmaa Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hussain ( CPSO# 89139 )

Business Address:
426 Talbot Street
Suite 103
St Thomas ON  N5P 1B9
Phone Number: (519) 637-8074

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASMAA SALAH HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012