Hussain, Fatima Maryam (CPSO#: 89666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Division Of Geriatric Medicine
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6586
Fax: (905) 494-6623
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peel Memorial Center
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-6586
Fax: (905) 494-6623
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-6586
Fax: (905) 494-6623
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Ali and F.M. Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 93965 )
Dr. F. Hussain ( CPSO# 89666 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 497-8844

Business Address:
c/o Division of Geriatric Medicine
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6586

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATIMA MARYAM HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2011