Hussain, Mohammed Farhan Iqbal (CPSO#: 92558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
Mental Health
5th Floor
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 33591
Fax: (416) 747-3350
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed F. I. Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussain ( CPSO# 92558 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Mental Health, 5th Floor
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3591

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2011 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Mohammad Farhan Iqbal Hussain may practise medicine independently in
                  Psychiatry, only.