Hussain, Nadeem Ayaz (CPSO#: 67271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Health Center
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B0-692
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 64312
Fax: (519) 646-6130
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC University Hospital
336 Windemere Road
London ON  N6A 4G5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadeem Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hussain ( CPSO# 67271 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B0-692
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADEEM AYAZ HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1997