Hussein, Elhadi Farag (CPSO#: 76772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000 Ext. 7074
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elhadi Hussein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hussein ( CPSO# 76772 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7074

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELHADI FARAG HUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007