Hussein, Mohammad Hasaballa (CPSO#: 93663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 2017

Expiry Date:  31 Aug 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Seashell Medical Centre
201 - 450 Bronte St S
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone: (905) 693-6733
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Hussein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussein ( CPSO# 93663 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
450 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone Number: (905) 693-6733

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Dec 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Mohammad  Hasaballa Hussein may practise paediatrics at the Seashell
                  Medical Centre in Milton, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by
                  a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires on August 31, 2019.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Hussein's knowledge, skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Hussein's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on December 13, 2017, and will expire  on  or
                  before August 31, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.