Hutchings, Katherine Keri (CPSO#: 94907)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katherine Hutchings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Meno Ya Win Health Centre Meno Ya Win Way Sioux Lookout, ON P8T 1B4 Phone: 807-737-3030
Instructions: All medical records will be retained by the hospital above.
Date Received: 25 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 04 Apr 2011 to 01 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018