Hutchison, Cindy (CPSO#: 72293)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Chiam, Cindy (used until: 30 Aug 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008