Huynh, Nhu Nguyet (CPSO#: 88812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Healthcare
Houses of Providence
2nd Floor
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3666
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nhu Huynh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Huynh ( CPSO# 88812 )

Business Address:
Providence Healthcare
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: (416) 285-3666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NHU NGUYET HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010