Huzel, Lisa Louise (CPSO#: 73367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.L. Huzel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Huzel ( CPSO# 73367 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA LOUISE HUZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUZEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 03 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1999