Hwang, Irene I Lan (CPSO#: 90738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Disera Drive, Unit 210
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone: (905) 771-7755
Fax: (905) 771-7752
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irene Hwang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Hwang ( CPSO# 90738 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
31 Disera Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone Number: (905) 771-7755

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE I LAN HWANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HWANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2012