Hyakutake, Momoe Tina (CPSO#: 94567)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 14 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2010 to 28 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2011