Hyrcza, Martin Dominik (CPSO#: 94289)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2010 to 22 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018