Iacobellis, Gianluca (CPSO#: 83759)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Rome, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 03 Oct 2005 to 25 Dec 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 26 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 05 Feb 2007
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010