Iancu, Daniela Elena (CPSO#: 97354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2012

Expiry Date:  12 Mar 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Mar 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Medical Imaging Department
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 17314
Fax: 6137614128
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniela Iancu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Iancu ( CPSO# 97354 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 6L8
Phone Number: (431) 997-9122

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Medical Imaging Department
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 301-7122

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Neuroradiology Effective: 29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jan 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Mar 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Daniela Elena Iancu may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  University  of  Ottawa,  in  which  Dr.  Iancu holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires seven  years  from
                  the date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. Iancu  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. Iancu's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Iancu's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  March  13,  2012.  In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will,  if  not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on March 12, 2019.