Iankova, Vesselina (CPSO#: 89232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English

Education:Medical University Sofia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
16880 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone: (905) 895-9777
Fax: (905) 895-9720
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VESSELINA IANKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IANKOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010