Ibey, Margaret Mary (CPSO#: 28976)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret Ibey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ibey ( CPSO# 28976 )

Business Address:
101 - 60 Bowes Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone Number: (705) 746-2181

Medical Records Location

Address: 101-60 Bowes St Parry Sound ON P2A 2L3
Date Received: 20 Nov 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 2018