Ibrahim, Ezzeldin Saleh Mohamed (CPSO#: 88211)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alexandria, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2008 to 05 Jun 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 06 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009