Ibrahim, Jawahir Ismail Abaker (CPSO#: 91290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 935-6414
Fax: (613) 935-8560
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAWAHIR ISMAIL ABAKER IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011