Iftene, Felicia (CPSO#: 89167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2008

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 20 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Vartic-Iftene, Felicia (used until: 19 Jul 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X7
Phone: (613) 548-6164
Fax: (613) 540-6196
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iftene Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Iftene ( CPSO# 89167 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Queen's University
School of Medicine
18 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6

Business Address:
Providence Care
Unit 2
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 548-6164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FELICIA IFTENE may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF PSYCHIATRY, QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY in which Dr. IFTENE holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. IFTENE may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. IFTENE no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. IFTENE no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. IFTENE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is 30 Jun 2019.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019