Iglesias, Ivan Ramon (CPSO#: 75153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 18 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8300
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iglesias Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Iglesias ( CPSO# 75153 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
Unit C3 111
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVAN RAMON IGLESIAS may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF ANAESTHESIA AND PERIOPERATIVE MEDICINE, THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. IGLESIAS holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. IGLESIAS may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. IGLESIAS no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. IGLESIAS no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. IGLESIAS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2009