Iizuka, Megumi (CPSO#: 76217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3101 Bloor Street West
Suite 401
Toronto ON  M8X 2W2
Phone: (416) 239-1968
Fax: (416) 233-4763
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital Health Cente
Eye Clinic
61 Queen Street East, 8th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Fax: (416) 864-6012
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 301
801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Canada
Phone: (647) 748-8377
Fax: (416) 619-5539
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

30 The Queensway
Eye Clinic
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6565
Fax: (416) 530-6291
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iizuka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Iizuka ( CPSO# 76217 )

Business Address:
401 - 3101 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M8X 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 239-1968

Business Address:
301 - 801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (647) 748-8377

Business Address:
Eye Clinic
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Ground Floor
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6565

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital Health Centre
8th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-7422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGUMI IIZUKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IIZUKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007