Ikesaka, Rick Takashi (CPSO#: 95117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave. E. Room F301
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-521-6024
Fax: 905-540-6568
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICK TAKASHI IKESAKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IKESAKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2016