Ilan, Roy (CPSO#: 79855)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Ilan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2017