Illamperuma Arachchige, Dilum Chanaka (CPSO#: 85775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:Ross University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Promenade Medical Centre
129 Church Street South
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1W4
Phone: (905) 884-0977
Fax: (905) 884-6454
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DILUM CHANAKA ILLAMPERUMA ARACHCHIGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILLAMPERUMA ARACHCHIGE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2007