Illyas, Ahmed Jehaan (CPSO#: 93005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Mood Disorders Program
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

123 James St. N, Suite 300
Hamilton ON  L8R2K8
Canada
Phone: 9056674847
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Jehaan Illyas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Illyas ( CPSO# 93005 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
123 James Street North
Hamilton ON  L8R 2K8
Phone Number: (905) 667-4848

Business Address:
505 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 525-3501

Business Address:
Box 585
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED JEHAAN ILLYAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILLYAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015