Imarengiaye, Charles Osalumese (CPSO#: 74599)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Benin, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2002