Inarejos Clemente, Emilio Jose (CPSO#: 97143)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Miguel Hernandez, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 06 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013