Inbar-Feigenberg, Michal (CPSO#: 95141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  25 Sep 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Div Clinical and Metabolic Genetics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8511
Fax: 416-8134940
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tomer Feigenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Inbar-Feigenberg ( CPSO# 95141 )
Dr. T. Feigenberg ( CPSO# 93915 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Michal Inbar-Feigenberg may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  the  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Inbar-
                        Feigenberg  holds  an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date of issuance or when Dr. Inbar-Feigenberg  no longer  holds  the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives   a   report   indicating  that  Dr.  Inbar-
                        Feigenberg's  clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,
                        professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee  makes  a  decision about Dr. Inbar-Feigenberg's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on September 26, 2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 25, 2023.