Incitti, Filomena (CPSO#: 72271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Geddes Medical Group
143 Metcalfe St
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (519) 846-2224
Fax: (519) 846-2005
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Filomena Incitti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Incitti ( CPSO# 72271 )

Business Address:
Geddes Medical Group
143 Metcalfe Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (519) 846-2224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FILOMENA INCITTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INCITTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2000