Ing, Robert Yun Kwing (CPSO#: 19353)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Ng, Robert Yun Kwing (used until: 13 Jan 1993 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Tulane University School of Medicine, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Apr 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Sep 1991