Ingber, Neil Jordan (CPSO#: 93571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yorkgate Mall
Suite 136 A
1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1
Phone: (416) 745-4555
Fax: (416) 745-0786
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1333 Neilson Road
Suite 100
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Canada
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Ingber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ingber ( CPSO# 93571 )

Business Address:
Yorkgate Mall
Suite 136A
1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 745-4555

Business Address:
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL JORDAN INGBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012