Inouye, Stephanie Anne Mariko (CPSO#: 90967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1835 Yonge Street
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone: 4164809779
Fax: 4164816949
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Inouye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 13 2015


Corporation Name: Inouye & Petrosoniak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Petrosoniak ( CPSO# 90994 )
Dr. S. Inouye ( CPSO# 90967 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 1-008E Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5976

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Care Hamilton
Department of Critical Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-9017

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
4th Floor, Room 436
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
Suite 302
1835 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 480-9779

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ANNE MARIKO INOUYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INOUYE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011