Iordanous, Yiannis (CPSO#: 93804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B1-110
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6074
Fax: (519) 646-6112
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iordanous Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nowakowski ( CPSO# 99452 )
Dr. Y. Iordanous ( CPSO# 93804 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare London
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YIANNIS IORDANOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IORDANOUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015