Iorio, Alfonso (CPSO#: 94768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Perugia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Crl 140-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 585-9140 Ext. 20152
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ATTN dr Alfonso Iorio
Juravinski Thrombosis Clinic
669 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42640
Fax: (905) 574-7625
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iorio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Iorio ( CPSO# 94768 )

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Suite CRL-140
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALFONSO IORIO may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH RESEARCH METHODS, EVIDENCE AND IMPACT, AND DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF GENERAL INTERNAL MEDICINE, MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. IORIO holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. IORIO may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. IORIO no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. IORIO no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. IORIO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jul 2015