Ip Fung Chun, Peter William (CPSO#: 103227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medicine
600 University Ave
Suite 427
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 586-5133
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM IP FUNG CHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IP FUNG CHUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018