Ip, Gregory Johanne Chung-Hon (CPSO#: 71457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Anesthesia
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Fax: 855-756-3454
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 Finch Ave W.
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-9420
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1333 Sheppard Ave E Suite 345
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 391-4048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

162 Cumberland St - Suite 225
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-0113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Centric Health Corporation
20 Wynford Drive - Suite 103
Toronto ON  M3C1J4
Canada
Phone: 416-441-2111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Ip Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ip ( CPSO# 71457 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 633-9420

Business Address:
345 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 391-4048

Business Address:
225 - 162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 925-0113

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHANNE CHUNG-HON IP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002