Ip, Wang-Chun William (CPSO#: 79426)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Brandon Regional Health Centre 150 McTavish Avenue East Brandon, MB R7A 2B3
Date Received: 12 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2014