Iqbal, Bland (CPSO#: 85692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Aug 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: (519) 429-6998
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bland Iqbal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Iqbal ( CPSO# 85692 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Bland  Iqbal may practice medicine independently in internal medicine as a
            hospitalist, only.