Iracleous, Panayiotis (CPSO#: 82933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Centenary Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 2B9
Phone: (416) 281-7404
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iracleous Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Iracleous ( CPSO# 82933 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Emergency Department
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PANAYIOTIS IRACLEOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRACLEOUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007