Irwin, Meredith Sue (CPSO#: 77439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 May 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Room 9402 Black Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 228454
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 May 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 May 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Mar 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Meredith Sue Irwin may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr.
                        Irwin   holds   a   geographical  full-time  teaching  or  research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required  by the teaching or research requirements of
                        her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically  expire when Dr. Irwin no longer holds
                  the appointment, referred to in clause 1.