Irwin, William Francis (CPSO#: 27857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
288 Westdale Avenue
Kingston ON  K7L 4S7
Phone: (613) 548-0900
Fax: (613) 548-0900
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANCIS IRWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRWIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1985