Isaac, Nicole Stephanie (CPSO#: 71092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health - Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Durham Radiology
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 101
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

47 Liberty st S
Bowmanville
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: 905-686-6411
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. G. Lacey ( CPSO# 67159 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. V. Massaad ( CPSO# 75329 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702


Corporation Name: Nicole Isaac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 686-6411

Business Address:
95 Bayley West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 686-6411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE STEPHANIE ISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002