Isaza-Zapata, Gloria Maria (CPSO#: 83863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Antioquia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Ophthalmology
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West P O Box 2000
3V2 Ophthalmology Clinic
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76662
Fax: (905) 521-2332
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gloria Isaza-Zapata Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Isaza-Zapata ( CPSO# 83863 )

Business Address:
Division of Opthalmology
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West PO Box 2000
3V2 Ophthalmology Clinic
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 May 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2005 to 21 Feb 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 22 Feb 2006 to 30 Apr 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Gloria Maria Isaza-Zapata may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division of Ophthalmology, McMaster University, in which Dr. Isaza-
                        Zapata holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Isaza-
                  Zapata no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.