Isfahanian, Naghmeh (CPSO#: 90627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Hamadan Medical School, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
699 Concession
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: 9053879495
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 03 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAGHMEH ISFAHANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISFAHANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 24 May 2012 to 23 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 24 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 24 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2015