Iskhakova, Maria Aleksandrovna (CPSO#: 82239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: Ishakova, Maria Aleksandrovna (used until: 16 Nov 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Kyrgyz State Medical Academy, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102, 3025 Singleton Avenue
London ON  N6L 0E6
Phone: (519)649-4858
Fax: (519)649-4858
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

400-80 King Street
Canad. Cannabis Clinic,Main Office
St Catharines ON  L2R 7G1
Canada
Phone: 888-256-7043 Ext. 800
Fax: 888-261-7116
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Iskhakova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Iskhakova ( CPSO# 82239 )

Business Address:
301 - 1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA ALEKSANDROVNA ISKHAKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISKHAKOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 09 May 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 10 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 30 Oct 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 21 Jan 2007 to 29 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 30 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008