Ismaeil, Nabeel Hashem Abdulhakim (CPSO#: 84215)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Aug 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 May 2006 to 13 Jul 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2007 to 30 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2018
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nabeel Hashem Abdulhakim Ismaeil to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 7, 2018:

Dr. Ismaeil has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.